THE ANGLICAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association seeks to uphold the traditional teaching of the Christian religion as held by the Church of England; it does so through grants and publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 March 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Davies | Trustee | 03 September 1988 |
|
|||||
REV A T HAWES | Trustee |
|
||||||
THE REVEREND CANON GEOFFREY NEAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE REVD FRANCIS DOUGLAS GARDOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.60k | £531 | £19 | £121 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £1.20k | £87 | £36.87k | £160 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 3RD SEPTEMBER 1989 AND AMENDED ON 30TH SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE DOCTRINE AND WORSHIP OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS DEFINED BY CANON A5 WHICH STATES THAT "THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IS GROUNDED BY THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, AND IN SUCH TEACHING OF THE ANCIENT FATHERS AND COUNCILS OF THE CHURCH AS ARE AGREEABLE TO THE SAID SCRIPTURES, AND IN PARTICULAR SUCH DOCTRINE IS TO BE FOUND IN THE THIRTY=NINE ARTICLES OF RELIGION, THE BOOK OF COMMON PRAYER AND THE ORDINAL".
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 TYNING ROAD
WINSLEY
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
BA15 2JJ
- Phone:
- 01225 862965
- Email:
- robinjbdavies2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window