MUSTARD SEED MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity during the period was that of advancement of Christian Faith and the extension of Kingdom of God. The charity is dedicated to inspiring and motivating God's people to reach their full potential in and through our Lord Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 March 1991: Standard registration
- 15 March 2024: Funds received from 1161662 SALVATION OF THE LIVING ROCK REVEALED
- THE MUSTARD SEED CHURCH (Previous name)
- WINNERS CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EBELECHUKWU UZOKA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARIE PETERS | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emmanuel King | Trustee |
|
||||||
HILDA NWOKEDI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.31k | £60.78k | £55.41k | £54.42k | £31.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.68k | £39.47k | £29.75k | £21.93k | £36.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 18 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1991 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE.2.THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE, LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 ALDERNEY ROAD
ERITH
DA8 2JD
- Phone:
- 01322330958
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window