Financial history THE NAUTICAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1002462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.57m £3.11m £3.71m £4.11m £5.35m
Total expenditure £3.29m £2.80m £3.01m £3.49m £4.28m
Income from government contracts £11.00k £11.50k £11.50k £11.50k £12.65k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £26.58k £218.46k
Income - Donations and legacies £156.20k £92.30k £102.13k £138.58k £353.30k
Income - Other trading activities £746.03k £575.82k £612.21k £481.16k £755.95k
Income - Charitable activities £2.63m £2.41m £2.94m £3.42m £4.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £41.00k £33.32k £46.05k £65.71k £90.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.54k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £20.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.83m £2.39m £2.58m £3.05m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £450.55k £410.56k £406.68k £422.40k £585.78k
Expenditure - Governance £603.47k £532.84k £573.33k £495.23k £582.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.33k
Expenditure - Other £11.74k £0 £13.87k £17.54k £0