SALFORD FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training of children, young people and adults - Salford, Gtr Manchester, North West
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,345,228
Donations and legacies | £26.34k | |
Charitable activities | £3.19m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £57.83k | |
Other | £70.42k |
Total expenditure:
£3,287,288
Raising funds | £21.00k | |
Charitable activities | £3.27m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,788,136 from 10 government contract(s) and £313,067 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £21.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.27m | |
Retained for future use | £57.94k |
People

75 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
333 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 April 1991: Standard registration
- 22 April 2016: Funds received from 1148985 FUTURE FOR YOUTH FOUNDATION
- SALFORD BEP (Working name)
- SALFORD BUSINESS EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- SALFORD COMPACT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert McClenaghan-Harrop | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hassall | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Aikman | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Caslake | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nouman Bhatty | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Eames | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin McDermott | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Grace Nkeshimana | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michala Marfleet | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Potier de la Morandiere | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Katharine Selina Francis | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER OPENSHAW | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62m | £1.68m | £1.53m | £3.01m | £3.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.41m | £1.52m | £1.60m | £2.80m | £3.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.04m | £641.98k | £588.79k | £1.76m | £1.79m | |
|
Income from government grants | £275.87k | £578.09k | £392.69k | £492.76k | £313.07k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £28.67k | £12.23k | £36.81k | £22.29k | £26.34k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.57m | £1.65m | £1.46m | £2.95m | £3.19m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £22.95k | £12.24k | £7.04k | £18.94k | £57.83k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £345 | £29.40k | £10.01k | £70.42k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.41m | £1.52m | £1.59m | £2.78m | £3.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £216 | £14.86k | £17.23k | £21.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.46k | £10.56k | £10.91k | £11.24k | £12.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £15.25k | £13.90k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £750.00k | £744.25k | £832.76k | £809.82k | £753.09k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.80m | £2.67m | £2.24m | £2.65m | £2.49m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.16m | £863.79k | £596.14k | £775.25k | £503.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/03/2016 as amended on 12 May 2018 as amended on 28 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 5-25 LIVING IN SALFORD, GREATER MANCHESTER AND THE NORTH WEST BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN SALFORD, GREATER MANCHESTER AND THE NORTH WEST. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Area of benefit
MAINLY WITHIN BOUNDARIES OF SALFORD C.C. EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salford Foundation
Foundation House
3 Jo Street
SALFORD
M5 4BD
- Phone:
- 01617878500
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window