JIM COUSINS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help young people in the Witney area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Veronica Holloway | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Drasdo | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melody Ann Clara Helm | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Fettes | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|||||
GARETH THOMAS ALTY | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Ian Leslie Lever | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Warwick Stanley | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.76k | £35.50k | £58.24k | £57.30k | £56.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.53k | £45.19k | £45.79k | £63.79k | £74.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST. FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
JIM COUSINS TRUST - REF 51029
24 CHURCH GREEN
WITNEY
OXFORDSHIRE
OX28 4AT
- Phone:
- 01993703941
- Website:
-
WWW.JIMCOUSINSTRUST.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window