CREDITON AREA HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise and arrange talks/lectures on local historical matters for our community. Maintain, operate and staff the Town,s Museum including fund raising for it,s upkeep. Provide historical information to the local schools and organisations as and when required. Organise ,record and safely store historical records in a local Mansion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
Governance
- 23 May 1991: Standard registration
- 13 February 2025: Funds received from 1011849 CREDITON AND DISTRICT VOLUNTEER CENTRE
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Stuart Gale | Chair | 12 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Lee | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Martin James Benwell | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helena Sykes | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Reeves | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Ann Lewis | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY WILLIAM SEDGWICK | Trustee | 07 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Keith Mortimer | Trustee | 07 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADELE GEORGETTE COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HEAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David John Nation | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.74k | £4.72k | £8.51k | £10.64k | £9.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.20k | £5.17k | £10.80k | £11.36k | £8.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1991, AS AMENDED 8 SEPTEMBER 1997, 13 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF CREDITON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA,IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM,MEETINGS,LECTURES AND OTHER SIMILAR EDUCATIONAL EVENTS.
Area of benefit
CREDITON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAHMS
The Old Town Hall
High St
Crediton
EX17 3LF
- Phone:
- 07894 439817
- Email:
- info@creditonhistory.org.uk
- Website:
-
creditonhistory.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window