Financial history COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR CALDERDALE

Charity number: 1002722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.78m £1.61m £3.06m £3.19m £3.16m
Total expenditure £1.86m £1.74m £2.65m £3.55m £3.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250.00k N/A £1.33m £1.57m £1.99m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.24m £1.08m £2.45m £9.51k £23.51k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £102.22k £96.83k £151.29k £2.63m £2.61m
Income - Endowments £693.78k £194.80k £98.63k £5.05k £4.96k
Income - Investment £436.03k £432.22k £452.41k £557.19k £532.05k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.72m £1.63m £2.51m £3.31m £2.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £143.90k £105.00k £133.76k £231.03k £274.85k
Expenditure - Governance £33.10k £32.88k £0 £34.45k £47.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.49m £1.42m £2.28m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £71.06k £55.82k £73.74k £32.12k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0