Financial history THE KITTY AND DANIEL NABARRO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1002786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.72k £20.76k £20.61k £328.03k £11.79k
Total expenditure £61.81k £46.88k £53.17k £68.88k £79.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A