CUERDEN VALLEY PARK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and Recreation for the public, Conservation and maintenance of the Park land
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 May 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Drinkwater | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bennett | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Singleton | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Taylor | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Barnfather | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Keith Gillies | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Jean McDonough Mrs | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Edward Clifford | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BEATTIE | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Donald Gardner | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANN MARSDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.54k | £342.64k | £254.20k | £296.61k | £316.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.81k | £160.44k | £305.86k | £433.18k | £539.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.47k | £1.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/02/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDE FOR THE RECREATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVISION OF PARKLAND
Area of benefit
CHORLEY AND SOUTH RIBBLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Visitor Centre
Berkeley Drive
Bamber Bridge
PRESTON
Lancashi
- Phone:
- 01772324436
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window