Financial history HASLEMERE SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1002907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £3.29k £500 £497 £500 £1.50k
Total expenditure £4.16k £2.81k £7.97k £10.09k £7.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A