THE DRAYCOTT WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a Village Hall for the use of the inhabitants of Draycott and neighbourhood without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 June 1991: Standard registration
- DRAYCOTT MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Anthony Warne | Chair | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Filer | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Elliott | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Dollins | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roger REESON | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Christine Fulton | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Miles Whittle | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jane Knight | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.38k | £47.48k | £46.29k | £37.58k | £44.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.12k | £24.33k | £76.60k | £24.04k | £51.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £28.06k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 05/02/1991 as amended on 19 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF DRAYCOTT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DRAYCOTT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aspen Cottage
Milking Lane
Draycott
CHEDDAR
BS27 3TL
- Phone:
- 07775526364
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window