ST ALBANS AND DACORUM DAY HOSPICE

Charity number: 1003462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Albans & Dacorum Day Hospice is part of Rennie Grove Hospice Care providing 24/7 responsive Hospice at Home service as well as a range of day services for patients and families in Herts .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £29,610
Total expenditure: £29,610

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GROVE HOUSE (Working name)
  • ROBERT RUNCIE DAY HOSPICE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Russell-Hogg Trustee 26 January 2023
RENNIE GROVE PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
RENNIE GROVE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
IAIN RENNIE HOSPICE AT HOME
Received: On time
JOHN VINCENT WROE Trustee 28 March 2019
PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
RENNIE GROVE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
IAIN RENNIE HOSPICE AT HOME
Received: On time
RENNIE GROVE PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £104.01k £0 £0 £0 £29.61k
Total expenditure £694.02k £0 £0 £0 £29.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rennie Grove Hospice Care
Waverley Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL3 5QX
Phone:
01727731006