AFRICA CHRISTIAN TEACHING SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity promotes the Christian Religion and works with partners to help individuals in difficult circumstances, orphans and widows in particular. The charity is committed to education and does this by sponsoring children and establishing schools in East Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 January 2025
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Burundi
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 July 1991: Standard registration
- ACTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND KEVIN JONES BA, MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Claire Campbell Smith | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Bingham | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNE-MARIE JONES | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY BUTERA | Trustee | 17 November 1989 |
|
|
||||
Georgette Butera BA | Trustee | 17 November 1989 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/01/2021 | 15/01/2022 | 15/01/2023 | 15/01/2024 | 15/01/2025 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.75k | £68.80k | £75.89k | £69.76k | £201.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.80k | £58.15k | £75.00k | £60.58k | £216.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 January 2025 | 28 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2025 | 28 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH. NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN THE U.K. AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 CRESTWOOD CLOSE
CREWE
CW2 6TB
- Phone:
- 01270664359
- Email:
- georgettebutera@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
acts-africa.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window