LIFE AND LIGHT FELLOWSHIP CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith and to assist and promote the education and training of people in all aspects of life. Also to provide support to relieve sickness and financial hardship and to promote and preserve good health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 1991: Standard registration
- THE UNITED EVANGELICAL PROJECT EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phyllis Beverley Wilson-Brown | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Dean | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ian Morrison | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR ADOLPHUS RONALD MCLAREN | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|||||
REVD JAMES ARTHUR HERBERT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.35k | £72.34k | £86.85k | £73.04k | £116.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.41k | £55.48k | £60.28k | £82.69k | £62.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01 JUN 1991 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIFE & LIGHT FELLOWSHIP
46 NINEVEH ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B21 0TT
- Phone:
- 07939215766
- Email:
- lifeandlight@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window