Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF ROTHERHAM SITWELL BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1003658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £39.53k £24.01k £22.52k £21.54k £21.88k
Total expenditure £31.03k £25.03k £20.47k £22.14k £14.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A