THE CONGELOW ORGANIC EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1003690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the general public in the principles of organic farming, growing and gardening.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £115,865
Total expenditure: £40,396

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ARTHUR REYNOLDS Chair
CRANBROOK AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: 67 days late
Caroline Anne Lingham Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Piers Wilfrid Allen Carey Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
MARK ENSOLL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £136.25k £901.70k £636.63k £33.42k £115.87k
Total expenditure £158.58k £29.76k £28.90k £40.99k £40.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £885.00k £636.63k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £16.70k £19.17k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £885.00k £636.63k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £21.94k £14.49k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £7.82k £14.41k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.94k £7.99k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £12.00k £6.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £3.56k £6.47k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 12 April 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 February 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 18 February 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lower Ellenden Farm
Water Lane
Hawkhurst
CRANBROOK
Kent
TN18 5AX
Phone:
01732770660
Website:

No information available