THE BECK COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Beck Community Centre provides a facility for multiple user groups of all ages in the South East area of Kendal , where no other such facility exists. These include Groups for babies, childminders,uniformed groups, senior citizens, Church, modern dance,ballet, keep fit , groups with disabilities,U3A groups, coffee mornings, charity fundraisers and the capacity for hire by local residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 02 September 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Whittaker | Chair | 30 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Hogg | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bishop | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Brook | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Brook | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ronnie Woodhouse | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
COBI HARTEVELD | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.23k | £21.03k | £24.89k | £19.42k | £22.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.26k | £10.25k | £19.90k | £16.75k | £28.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £11.69k | £22.06k | £850 | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/04/2015 as amended on 27 Apr 2019 as amended on 21 Apr 1922
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, POLITICS, RELIGION, DISABILITY OR OTHER OPINION. 2.TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE COMMUNITY CENTRE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
BOUNDED BY WINDERMERE RAILWAY LINE, TO OXENHOLME ROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BECK COMMUNITY CENTRE
ESTHWAITE AVENUE
KENDAL
LA9 7NZ
- Phone:
- 07923405736
- Email:
- WHITTAKER135@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
beckcommunitycentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window