Financial history THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LOGISTICS AND TRANSPORT IN THE UK

Charity number: 1004963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.04m £3.79m £5.17m £4.61m £5.52m
Total expenditure £3.83m £3.42m £4.42m £5.40m £5.33m
Income from government contracts £192.00k £78.63k £128.87k £66.06k £74.57k
Income from government grants £165.00k £13.00k £250.00k £95.00k £300.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £118.00k £113.00k £864.00k £290.00k £1.03m
Income - Other trading activities £301.00k £139.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.30m £3.36m £4.16m £4.17m £4.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £67.00k £69.00k £62.00k £59.00k £81.73k
Income - Other £252.00k £115.00k £82.00k £91.00k £106.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.77m £3.38m £4.40m £5.38m £5.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.00k £38.00k £15.00k £16.00k £16.39k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £65.10k £32.00k £15.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £91.00k £105.00k £335.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £16.00k £16.39k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0