THE CHAWN HILL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mainly making grants according to the wishes of donors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dudley
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER WICKHAM KING | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DR WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.25k | £66.71k | £13.64k | £19.96k | £14.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.51k | £59.80k | £18.06k | £19.92k | £15.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 September 2022 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 September 2022 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBUARY 1981 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION 21 APRIL 1989 AND THE 12 DECEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY 1. THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF EVANGELISM GENERALLY AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHATSOEVER INCLUDING THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF THE EVANGELIST WORK OF ANY EVANGELIST 2.THE SUPPORT OF THE ACTIVITIES OF ANY CHRISTIAN CHURCH OR ORGANISATION WHOSE BELIEFS ARE NOT SUBSTANTIALLY IN CONFLICT WITH THE BASIS OF BELIEF 3.THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS HOLDING SUCH BELIEFS AND ENGAGED IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR OTHER DEVELOPMENTAID IN FURTHERANCE OF THE GLORIOUS GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST 4.ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH IN THE TRUSTEES OPINION FURTHERS THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF EVANGELISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 STOURBRIDGE ROAD
HAGLEY
STOURBRIDGE
DY9 0QS
- Phone:
- 01562720368
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window