131ST SHEFFIELD (GRENOSIDE) GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
131st Sheffield (Grenoside) Guides provides activities for girls and young women aged from 4 to 18 years. Our activities follow the Guide Association syllabus and guidelines giving our members opportunities to try new challenges and experiences in a safe and fun environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 30 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MERCER | Chair | 08 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Sophie Glennon-Brown | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Nisbet | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hewerdine | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elliott | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.04k | £22.22k | £20.08k | £20.04k | £15.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.85k | £5.12k | £19.17k | £19.09k | £44.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.65k | £9.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
GRENOSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
Scout & Guide Hut
Salt Box Lane
Grenoside
SHEFFIELD
S35 8QS
- Phone:
- 07788897840
- Email:
- grenosandg@gmail.com
- Website:
-
grenosidescoutsandguides.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window