PROSTATE CANCER UK

Charity number: 1005541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Prostate Cancer UK fights to help more men survive prostate cancer and enjoy a better quality of life. We support men living with prostate cancer, prostate diseases and the effects of treatment. We find answers by funding research and we lead change by campaigning and collaborating. We are the country's leading charity for men with prostate cancer and prostate problems.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1991: Standard registration
  • 29 March 2019: Funds received from 1144937 HW ABBOTT WILL TRUST
  • 15 May 2019: Funds received from 802039 THE DOMINIC KING FUND
  • 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1080493 THE BASIL LARSEN 1999 CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 06 May 2022: Funds received from 1074496 JESSIE ELIZABETH KENT CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 15 August 2022: Funds received from 1030925 ROTARY CLUB OF WATERLOOVILLE TRUST FUND
  • 12 February 2025: Funds received from 238259 CRITCHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 14 April 2025: Funds received from 1190700 SWADLINCOTE & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE PROSTATE CANCER CHARITY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Doris Harriette Olulode Chair 27 October 2022
PROSTATE ACTION
Received: On time
Professor Catharine Mary Louise West Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Dr Maha Hussain Trustee 13 October 2023
None on record
Jennifer Liebenberg Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Artis Trustee 28 July 2022
THE KEEPERS AND GOVERNORS OF THE POSSESSIONS, REVENUES AND GOODS OF THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON, WITHIN THE TOWN OF HARROW-ON-THE-HILL
Received: On time
THE FOOTBALL LEAGUE (COMMUNITY) LIMITED
Received: On time
Support Through Court
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF EORTC
Received: On time
PROSTATE ACTION
Received: On time
Michael John McGrath Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record
Dr Nicholas Rooke Hicks Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
PAUL MICHAEL STEWART Trustee 20 September 2021
TANWORTH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Kenneth Ian Towle Trustee 26 January 2021
None on record
Henry Awele Obi Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Samia al Qadhi Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Cristian Cussen Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.02m £27.87m £35.44m £33.95m £43.82m
Total expenditure £30.62m £22.29m £25.06m £34.34m £51.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £802.00k £2.41m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.37m £27.39m £34.95m £32.69m £40.96m
Income - Other trading activities £422.00k £395.00k £419.00k £541.00k £683.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £226.00k £79.00k £73.00k £722.00k £2.18m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.16m £3.95m £6.49m £6.18m £6.32m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.83m £15.82m £15.69m £24.92m £41.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.79m £6.48m £9.38m £9.42m £10.34m
Expenditure - Governance £32.00k £33.00k £39.00k £44.00k £46.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.48m £5.80m £958.00k £9.58m £25.22m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £143.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £624.00k £556.00k £322.00k £120.00k £15.00k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £15.93m
Other assets £42.15m £48.47m £56.79m £57.63m £55.94m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £22.39m £23.07m £20.77m £21.80m £42.61m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FOURTH FLOOR
THE COUNTING HOUSE
53 TOOLEY STREET
LONDON
SE1 2QN
Phone:
02033107000