Paper Boat

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is UK based with its Headquarters in Oxford. The charity raises funds from individuals worldwide which are then remitted to approved Non Government Organisations (NGO) in South India and Thailand.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
- India
Governance
- 15 November 1991: Standard registration
- JHC (Working name)
- Paper Boat (Working name)
- THE JOE HOMAN CHARITY (Working name)
- JOE HOMAN CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Proctor | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Bert O'Donoghue | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Wetherall | Trustee | 07 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Arun Thangarj CHINNARAJ JOSEPH JAIKUMAR | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.79k | £90.54k | £496.27k | £91.54k | £43.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.15k | £208.80k | £155.88k | £181.87k | £161.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 NOV 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 SEP 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 OCT 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 DEC 2020 as amended on 27 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
The prevention or relief of poverty and inequality by advancing formal and informal education as well as developing capacity and skills for people and communities in need anywhere in the world, in particular but not exclusively children and youth, in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and participate more fully in society for the public benefit
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paper Boat Ltd
1 and 3 Kings Meadow
Osney Mead
Oxford
Ox2 0DP
- Phone:
- 01865800019
- Email:
- info@paperboatcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window