Financial history THE THOMAS TRUST

Charity number: 1006312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £22.30k £1.37k £13.94k £945 £4.82k
Total expenditure £37.63k £7.63k £37.78k £7.77k £10.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A