KINGSWOOD HERITAGE MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1006501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ESTABLISH A MUSEUM TO PROMOTE, AND PRESERVE THE HERITAGE OF KINGSWOOD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £60,181
Total expenditure: £49,207

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RODNEY GEORGE STONE Chair
None on record
Kay Ross Trustee 07 October 2021
AVON GARDENS TRUST
Received: On time
Alan Chillcott Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Muriel Quantrill Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
STEPHEN JOHN WOOD Trustee 17 January 2017
None on record
LYNDA BLACKWELL Trustee 22 December 2013
None on record
JOHN WILLIAM DOUGLAS Trustee
None on record
FRED ALAN BRYANT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.72k £69.60k £42.33k £37.67k £60.18k
Total expenditure £46.13k £47.27k £38.00k £37.22k £49.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £46.89k £15.86k £4.80k £14.10k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 July 2024 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 July 2024 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kingswood Heritage Museum
Tower Lane
Warmley
BRISTOL
BS30 8XT
Phone:
01179678248