Financial history LLANIGON AND HAY RURAL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1006647
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.54k £14.90k £12.34k £9.80k £11.87k
Total expenditure £12.98k £6.34k £12.34k £6.97k £10.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £13.00k £10.00k N/A N/A