WITNEY MUSEUM AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We collect, conserve and display items of local historical interest. We have a large collection in excess of 60,000 photographs. We are compiling a collection of local oral history tapes. The museum is visited by groups of school children and local groups eg. WI pensioners etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 December 1991: Standard registration
- WITNEY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM (Working name)
- WEST OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUM CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Abrams | Chair | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Early Crawford | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Gillian Fettes | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jean Marion Greenway | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £17.73k | £3.81k | £6.70k | £7.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.13k | £7.72k | £18.45k | £7.08k | £12.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/08/2013
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM COMPRISING THE EXISTING COLLECTION TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER EXHIBITS OR ITEMS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION. (B)TO FORM ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT AND TO AID IN THE FORMATION ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE COMPANIES INSTITUTIONS ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS OR SOCIETIES FORMED FOR OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE.
Area of benefit
WEST OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Witney Museum & Historical Society
GLOUCESTER COURT MEWS
75 HIGH STREET
WITNEY
OX28 6JA
- Phone:
- 01993775915
- Email:
- admin@witneymuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window