lps21 ltd

Charity number: 1006900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education for the public benefit through the promotion of the artswith particular, but not exclusive, reference to the visual arts of printmaking and graphic design.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,042
Total expenditure: £34,629

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LPS (Working name)
  • LONDON PRINT STUDIO (Previous name)
  • LONDON PRINT WORKSHOP (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr David Dawson Ferry Chair 29 April 2021
ROYAL SOCIETY OF PAINTER-PRINTMAKERS
Received: On time
THE SIDNEY NOLAN TRUST
Received: On time
BANKSIDE GALLERY LIMITED
Received: On time
CHELSEA ARTS CLUB TRUST
Received: On time
David William Logan Westhead Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Anthony Downing Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Noel Anthony Godber Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
Maike Naho Matsuda Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £283.56k £756.18k £3.37k £1.24k £3.04k
Total expenditure £292.45k £229.48k £69.57k £38.91k £34.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £168.61k £161.68k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.86k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.76k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £104.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £127 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £648.24k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £227.36k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £2.12k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 March 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 Fairbarn Road
Sheffield
South Yorkshire
S6 5PP
Phone:
07932060801