BOROUGH CARE SERVICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Borough Care Services Limited provides high quality, person centred care, accommodation and ancillary services to older people. In particular, Borough Care Services Limited supports people with dementia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Wigan
Governance
- 20 December 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard David Parry | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Speight Mr | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayesh Patel | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Bristlin | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Higgins | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Robert Armstrong | Trustee | 18 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.00k | £125.00k | £42.00k | £42.00k | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.00k | £172.00k | £87.00k | £55.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 17 OCTOBER 1991, 17 DECEMBER 1991 AND 14 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND DOMICILIARY CARE FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF AGE, ILLNESS, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pepper House
Market Street
Nantwich
Cheshire
CW5 5DQ
- Phone:
- 01270613504
- Email:
- chris.hughes@belong.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window