NADEZHDA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust continues to support a wide range of projects but with a particular emphasis on Ethiopia, a country where there are significant needs appropriate to the Trusts objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 10 January 1992: Standard registration
- KINGSTON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Ralph Collins | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM MARTIN KINGSTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Jill Mary Kingston | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MARK CONOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.05k | £3.59k | £7.52k | £16.15k | £14.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.21k | £6.70k | £3.67k | £17.45k | £23.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE AND INSTRUCT THE RESIDENTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (2)TO SPONSOR AND FINANCE CHARITABLE PROJECTS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY (4) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE SUPPORT OF NON RELIGIOUS CHARITIES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kemble House
Kemble
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 6AD
- Phone:
- 01285771133
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window