Governance OPERATION MOBILISATION
Charity number: 1008196
Up to date
Registration history:
- 12 February 1992: Standard registration
- 01 March 2019: Funds received from 1112749 RELIEF EDUCATION DEVELOPMENT INTERNATIONAL
- 09 November 2021: Funds received from 1113880 KALJI TRUST
- 25 August 2022: Funds received from 1070797 LIGHT TO ALL NATIONS
- 11 July 2023: Funds received from 226084 ALUM ROCK HALL TRUST
- 12 January 2024: Funds received from 1165779 RUSHMERE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- DALIT EDUCATION (Working name)
- FREE A DALIT CHILD (Working name)
- LIFEHOPE (Working name)
- OM (Working name)
- OM UK (Working name)
- OM UNITED KINGDOM (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.