THE JONATHAN LEVENE MUSIC SCHOLARSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Award scholarships to music students
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Israel
Governance
- 26 March 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RONNIE LEVENE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Allan Blank | Trustee | 20 February 1992 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HENRY MARX | Trustee |
|
||||||
EVA LILIAN LEVENE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY HARVEY PAYDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEANETTE MARX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH SOPHIA CANTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN LAWRENCE FINK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN CELINA FRANCES PAYDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL BRIAN LESSER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN CANTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANETTE LESSER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA MARCELLE FINK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.71k | £12.81k | £14.04k | £18.48k | £16.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.00k | £16.50k | £11.05k | £20.50k | £13.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
(A)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE AWARDED TO MUSIC STUDENTS STUDYING AT A RECOGNISED ACADEMY OF MUSIC IN ISRAEL OR ELSEWHERE TO BE CHOSEN BY THE TRUSTEES. (B)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE AWARDED TO STUDENTS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 STUDYING AT AN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION IN ISRAEL OR ELSEWHERE TO BE CHOSEN BY THE TRUSTEES
Area of benefit
ISRAEL AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A Norland Place
LONDON
W11 4QG
- Phone:
- 020 3841 7470
- Email:
- john.blank@patronlaw.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window