L'ASSOCIATION DES JURISTES FRANCO-BRITANNIQUES/THE FRANCO-BRITISH LAWYERS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S MAIN AIM IS TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND WITHIN THAT TRAINING OF LAWYERS INTO PRACTICE OF FRENCH, ENGLISH AND SCOTS LAW AND TO FACILITATE EXCHANGES BETWEEN STUDENTS , ACADEMICS AND LAWYERS FROM THESE COUNTRIES AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND TO PROMOTE INFORMATION RELATING TO AND OF THE CONSTITUENT LEGAL SYSTEMS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

28 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 1992: Standard registration
- A J F B (Working name)
- FBLS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADVOCATE IAN STEWART FORRESTER KC | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lady Mary Howarth Arden | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lord Justice John Bernard McCloskey | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Floriane Louise Laruelle | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maeve Lise Oxanne Guyot | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ariane de Guillenschmidt Guignot | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine PEDAMON | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lord Ericht Andrew Fleming Stewart | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephane Michel Rene Bonifassi | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Le Grand de Belleroche | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES PIERRE OLIVIER JEAN RENE ED du COUEDIC de KERERANT | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE ANNE CULLY | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
LEONARDO CARPENTIERI | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas JONDET | Trustee | 02 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GUILD | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE PALMER | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
FREDERIC GOLDBERG | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAITRE IRENE ARNAUDEAU | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE FORREST | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAITRE CAROL XUEREF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MADAME KATHERINE DANDRIEUX LISFRANC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAITRE BEATRICE CASTELLANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONSIEUR ARISTIDE LEVI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY LEEONA JUNE DORRIAN QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAITRE BERNARD VATIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES DAFYDD STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY OSBORN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.92k | £15.25k | £14.59k | £29.65k | £16.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.11k | £11.89k | £14.40k | £31.62k | £22.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 November 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1989, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 18TH FEBRUARY 1991 AND 6TH DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE PRACTICE OF ENGLISH SCOTTISH AND FRENCH LAW GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULARLY IN THE CONTEXT OF THE EUROPEAN COMMUNITY AND ITS CONSTITUTIVE TREATIES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FRANCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LE DISPENSAIRE FRANCAIS
184 HAMMERSMITH ROAD
LONDON
W6 7DJ
- Phone:
- 07739 437739
- Email:
- fbls@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window