YORKSHIRE R F U YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation, provision or assistance to encourage pupils at schools and universities or other places of higher education as well as persons under the age of 21 to play Rugby Union Football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Rathmell | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Stephens | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pollard | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Breakwell | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTYN HEALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD ARTHUR ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £17.34k | £2.94k | £2.95k | £3.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.87k | £157 | £209 | £173 | £170 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
(1) PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE OR ENCOURAGE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER PLACES OF HIGHER EDUCATION TO PLAY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL OR ANY OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS (2) PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit SF05
City Mills Business Centre
Peel Street
Morley
Leeds
LS27 8QL
- Phone:
- 01132524300
- Email:
- phil.shand@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window