Financial history HALF MOON YOUNG PEOPLE'S THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1010192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £718.50k £714.83k £897.29k £841.68k £831.36k
Total expenditure £701.88k £665.83k £825.89k £889.56k £822.93k
Income from government contracts £78.66k £63.00k £99.49k £75.00k £75.00k
Income from government grants £251.79k £358.96k £345.52k £263.60k £264.72k
Income - Donations and legacies £259.88k £336.93k £265.60k £296.72k £287.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £458.07k £377.76k £631.56k £529.70k £520.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £544 £145 £131 £2.46k £2.57k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £12.80k £20.87k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £659.31k £620.29k £783.23k £883.26k £822.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.56k £45.54k £42.66k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.03k £15.46k £15.34k £7.50k £8.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £6.30k £364