THE TALBOT HOUSE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to schools and colleges providing courses in the performing arts in the UK for bursaries for students needing financial assistance. Students must meet the criteria of the Talbot House Trust. (Performing arts includes music, drama and dance)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 March 1992: Standard registration
- 12 October 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1152367 NATIONAL YOUTH ARTS TRUST
- LISKEARD CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.54k | £8.98k | £9.39k | £7.34k | £7.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.58k | £12.49k | £12.55k | £10.30k | £11.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window