THAMES EXPLORER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an educational charity providing historical, geographical and environmental education about the Thames. We promote access, physical, intellectual and emotional to the Thames and it's environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 May 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. JAMES WISDOM | Chair |
|
||||||||||
MARLENE JOHNSON | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|||||||||
DAVE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
VALERIE BOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MICHAEL WOODMORE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JANET PEEK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.07k | £189.03k | £185.81k | £229.95k | £235.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.60k | £134.48k | £168.02k | £188.27k | £242.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH JUNE 1989, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 21ST JANUARY 1992.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE HISTORY AND OTHER ASPECTS OF THE RIVER THAMES, ITS TRIBUTARIES AND BANKS AND OTHER ASSOCIATED FEATURES. TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE ON OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE RIVER THAMES FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PIER HOUSE
CORNEY REACH WAY
LONDON
W4 2UG
- Phone:
- 02087420057
- Email:
- info@thames-explorer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window