TINNITUS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tinnitus UK helps anyone affected by tinnitus, including people who have tinnitus and those close to them. Acts to educate and train professionals and the general public. Commissions research and supports training. We seek to increase awareness of tinnitus and increase the volume and impact of tinnitus research to find a cure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 May 1992: Standard registration
- 15 February 2021: Funds received from 1021780 STANLEY CLAYTON TRUST
- Tinnitus UK (Working name)
- BRITISH TINNITUS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Elizabeth Colenso | Chair | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Stone | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Heron | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Veronica Jane Kennedy Carragher | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BERNARD CORCORAN | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35m | £1.36m | £860.55k | £876.57k | £484.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £996.46k | £1.27m | £1.28m | £1.04m | £927.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.14m | £1.22m | £686.44k | £729.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £64.02k | £0 | £17.42k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £129.43k | £97.43k | £144.50k | £137.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.16k | £7.44k | £12.19k | £6.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £35.91k | £0 | £2.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £659.48k | £949.27k | £181.11k | £391.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £749.04k | £1.00m | £903.86k | £733.56k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £185.96k | £175.33k | £289.02k | £280.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.14k | £9.53k | £11.10k | £25.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £279.90k | £0 | £11.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £4.77k | £4.71k | £6.62k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £61.47k | £88.60k | £88.19k | £28.82k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 APR 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND ALLEVIATION OF TINNITUS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tinnitus UK
Unit 5
Acorn Business Park
Woodseats Close
SHEFFIELD
S8 0TB
- Phone:
- 01142509933
- Email:
- info@tinnitus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window