ALLENDALE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a meeting place,and recreation ground, for local community activities and pastimes and therefore to improve the quality of life of the inhabitants of the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 22 May 1992: Standard registration
- ALLENDALE VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- ALLENDALE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- ALLENDALE VILLAHE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Timothy Milsom | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Jenifer Miriam Hatto | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sam Coulson | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Christopher John Bonsall | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kerry Crellin | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Alexander Lindsay Hill | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Garner | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Sandison | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Amanda Charlton | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dorothy Elizabeth Collier | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Stirling Hill | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JANET LENNARD | Trustee | 28 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET STONEHOUSE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DR STEPHANIE ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.87k | £19.18k | £14.60k | £46.27k | £56.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.11k | £17.63k | £14.63k | £50.79k | £42.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 11TH JULY 2002. as amended on 26 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
ALLENDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALLENDALE VILLAGE HALL
LEADGATE
ALLENDALE
HEXHAM
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE47 9PR
- Phone:
- 01434618022
- Email:
- castirlinghill@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window