THE PIED PIPER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pied Piper Appeal was founded in 1992 by Mr Peter Hickman MBE, with the aim to improve the lives of sick children in Gloucestershire by providing extra facilities that would comfort, reassure and give the best possible equipment when children are most in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£859,740
Donations and legacies | £381.85k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £475.00k | |
Investments | £2.89k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£671,429
Raising funds | £311.15k | |
Charitable activities | £360.28k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £311.15k | |
Charitable expenditure | £360.28k | |
Retained for future use | £188.31k |
People

7 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- THE PIED PIPER APPEAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Edward Arnold Caton | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Everson | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lawrence Viney | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Gomery | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clara Thompson | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Wilmer | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Day | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Hage | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy William Fry | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wilkey | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Kent | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS ANTHONY MARK BROADY | Trustee | 30 June 2006 |
|
|||||
Dr Roger John Head | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482.25k | £302.84k | £348.17k | £628.36k | £859.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £423.70k | £301.62k | £384.30k | £498.89k | £671.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.14k | £32.81k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £240.44k | £381.85k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £387.91k | £475.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5 | £2.89k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £7.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £254.45k | £360.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £244.44k | £311.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.35k | £1.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £251.10k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £546.23k | £748.50k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £222.35k | £236.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 21 JANUARY 2010 as amended on 07 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONST CHILDREN AND B) IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING 1) TO ASSIST FURTHER, PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES CARRIED ON BY THE GLOUCESTER HEALTH AUTHORITY OR ITS SUCCESSOR. 2) TO RAISE AND APPLY MONEY FOR THE BUILDING OF A NEW CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL IN THE REGION, ADMINISTERED BY THE GLOUCESTER HEALTH AUTHORITY OR ITS SUCCESSOR AND THEREAFTER TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES NEEDED TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS OF CARE FOR CHILDREN
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINTON LODGE
HIGHNAM
GLOUCESTER
GL28DF
- Phone:
- 01452501117
- Email:
- office@piedpiperappeal.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window