THE SCHOOL FEES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting children in independent education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MARTYN CHRISTOPHER GOWAR | Chair |
|
||||||
Christopher Shipley | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Berry | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Roskilly | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Angus Cater MA | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Norman Wallace | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Love | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.52k | £25.09k | £25.30k | £25.00k | £30.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.68k | £60.28k | £97.20k | £14.80k | £20.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 18TH OCTOBER 1991, AMENDED 27TH MAY 1992
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND (IF MORE THAN ONE) IN SUCH SHARES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE (AND IN THE FOREGOING) TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS ATTENDING PREPARATORY PUBLIC OR OTHER INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS OR HIGHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Swan Street
Kingsclere
NEWBURY
Berkshire
RG20 5PR
- Phone:
- 01306746309
- Email:
- trustsecretary@sfctrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window