THE LEONARD SAINER LEGAL EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting persons in the study of the law by providing scholarships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 June 1992: Standard registration
- LEONARD SAINER FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Grose | Trustee | 07 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN PHILIP SAINER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.39k | £20.12k | £31.00k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.88k | £43.01k | £43.95k | £23.17k | £42.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MAY 1992
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY MAY DETERMINE. IN PARTICULAR TO PERPETUATE THE MEMORY OF LEONARD SAINER BY FURTHERING EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH SPECIFICALLY BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS LOANS OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO STUDENTS INTENDING TO PRACTICE AS SOLICITORS OR BARRISTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
160 QUEEN VICTORIA STREET
LONDON
EC4V 4QQ
- Phone:
- 02071847000
- Email:
- charles.corman@dechert.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window