Financial history DEVON AND CORNWALL RECORD SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1011931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.32k £14.45k £12.68k £14.98k £11.82k
Total expenditure £25.67k £21.82k £16.46k £9.68k £6.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A