THE BRUNSWICK TOWN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
History,conservation and education, with a main focus on the Regency period and Brighton & Hove but with historical and geographical interests beyond these where appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 01 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NEIL BINGHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Colin Ian Hill Cross FRICS | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|||||
SARAH GIBBINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.34k | £141.29k | £153.40k | £72.08k | £62.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.08k | £85.45k | £188.14k | £86.09k | £75.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS SHALL MEAN THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE OF THE RELEVANT BUILDINGS AS AN EXAMPLE OF THE ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN OF ITS PERIOD AND THE TECHNIQUES AND METHODS PROPERLY APPLICABLE TO THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF SUCH RELEVANT BUILDING.
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON AND HOVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Regency Town House
13 Brunswick Square
Hove
BN3 1EH
- Phone:
- 01273 206306
- Email:
- nick@rth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window