Financial history RICHARD SHUTTLEWORTH TRUSTEES

Charity Number: 1012224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £0 £5.39m £5.88m £5.32m £6.08m
Total expenditure £0 £4.85m £5.99m £5.23m £5.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £700.00k £5.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £332.00k £784.00k £256.00k £333.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.28m £1.71m £1.84m £2.05m
Income - Charitable activities N/A £671.00k £1.10m £934.00k £1.23m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.40m £2.27m £2.29m £2.47m
Income - Other N/A £701.00k £5.00k £1.00k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £87.00k £54.00k £10.00k £35.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £2.86m £3.34m £2.62m £3.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.99m £2.65m £2.61m £2.51m
Expenditure - Governance N/A £138.00k £131.00k £156.00k £217.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £255.00k £305.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £38.00k £40.00k £38.00k £6.00k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0