SWANSEA VALE RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and restoration of heritage railway artefacts, especially those relating to the former railways of the lower Swansea valley and South West Wales. The society acts as an umbrella organisation for a variety of interest groups with similar aims and objectives to the Swansea Vale Railway Society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 29 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMLYN WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Kyle Chalmers | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Bowen | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Ian David Morris | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £424 | £180 | £138 | £280 | £279 | |
|
Total expenditure | £45 | £0 | £0 | £150 | £130 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JUNE 1992.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, RESTORE AND OPERATE ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE RAILWAY IN THE LOWER SWANSEA VALLEY AS A PUBLIC EXHIBITION AND MUSEUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF TECHNICAL, HISTORICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION, AND FOR THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION, DISPLAY AND DEMONSTRATION OF STEAM AND OTHER RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK, EQUIPMENT AND RELICS OF HISTORICAL, OPERATIONAL AND GENERAL INTEREST, AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LOWER SWANSEA VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 GLASFRYN ROAD
PONTARDDULAIS
SWANSEA
SA4 8LL
- Phone:
- 07857650426
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
swanseavalerailway.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window