THE ESHER AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The service provides free, independent, confidential and impartial advice to everyone on their rights and responsibilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £144,704 from 5 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 July 1992: Standard registration
- 04 February 2022: Funds received from 1142319 CITIZENS ADVICE SURREY
- THE ESHER AND MOLESEY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Reason | Chair | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer McGurk | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Alldis | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Murphy | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Bax | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Sally Lynn Williams | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Gillian Avril Coates | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frank Thaxton | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ronald Hickson | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Wood | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.93k | £189.51k | £178.28k | £167.86k | £235.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.19k | £176.06k | £190.73k | £177.65k | £234.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.76k | £107.70k | £93.89k | £99.15k | £144.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 1ST JUNE 1992 AND AMENDED 4TH OCTOBER 2004 AND 31ST JANUARY 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 MAY 2016 as amended on 09 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN ESHER, MOLESEY, CLAYGATE, OXSHOTT AND COBHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
ESHER, MOLESEY, CLAYGATE, OXHOTT & COBHAM - ALL IN SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citizens Advice Esher & District
Civic Centre
High Street
ESHER
Surrey
KT10 9RP
- Phone:
- 01372462100
- Email:
- bureau@eshercab.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window