SPORLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run and maintain Sporle Community Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 17 July 1992: Standard registration
- 17 March 2022: Funds received from 297762 SPORLE AID SCHEME
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John William Corley | Chair | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Burrows | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Gooch | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Richards | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Burrows | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
GORDON BURROWS | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN JANE CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £10.24k | £5.06k | £5.69k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.41k | £3.81k | £8.92k | £9.50k | £6.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST APRIL 1974.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SPORLE IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND TO HOLD LAND (HEREINAFTER CALLED `THE TRUST PROPERTY') FOR SUCH PURPOSES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING THE USE FOR WORSHIP OR ANY RELIGIOUS MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE PARISH OF SPORLE AND ITS INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAMBRIDGE COTTAGE
LOVE LANE
SPORLE
KING'S LYNN
PE32 2EP
- Phone:
- 01760723718
- Email:
- g.burrows041@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window