THE LEONARDO DA VINCI SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Leonardo da Vinci Society provides a forum for those interested in Leonardo or aspects of the culture of his time to which he contributed. The Society's interests also extend to the Art/Science overlap in other periods. The Society holds an Annual Lecture, publishes a Newsletter and holds Symposia on relevant topics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Alexander John Marr | Chair | 09 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Francesca Borgo | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucia Tantardini | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Clayton | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fabrizio Bigotti | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mari Elen Wyn Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr MATTHEW Hayden LANDRUS | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Jeremy Oosterhoff | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Dilwyn Knox | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maya Corry | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Austin Talbot | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Frank James | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Francis Ashbee Ames-Lewis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JULIANA BARONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY JOHN SCOTT MANN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | £0 | £0 | £230 | £815 | |
|
Total expenditure | £237 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £265 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE STUDY OF THE LIFE, WORK AND INFLUENCE OF LEONARDO, HIS INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL MILIEU, AND AGAINST THE BACKGROUND OF HIS TIME; AND THROUGH CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER ENTITIES WITH SIMILAR AIMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o DR MARI WILLIAMS
42 DEVIZES ROAD
OLD TOWN
SWINDON
SN1 4BG
- Phone:
- 07941361380
- Email:
- mariewwilliams10@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window