Accounts and annual returns THE UKANA MATERNITY HOSPITAL PROJECT

Charity number: 1012893
Charity reporting is overdue by 1611 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 516 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 516 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 881 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 881 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1246 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1246 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1611 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1611 days