Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SUTTON NONSUCH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1013306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.09k £7.17k £12.73k £7.92k £6.18k
Total expenditure £12.53k £6.61k £13.34k £9.62k £6.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A